Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/27/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/27/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/10/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/12/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/12/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/12/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/12/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/12/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/12/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/12/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/19/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/19/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/25/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/06/2000