Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 06/22/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/22/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/20/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/26/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/12/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/12/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/12/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/12/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/12/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/14/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/14/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/19/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/21/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/21/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/26/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/03/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/03/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/03/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/04/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/04/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/10/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/10/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/11/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/11/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/11/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/11/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/11/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/12/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/12/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/16/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/16/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/16/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/17/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/17/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/19/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/26/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/31/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/31/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/02/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/02/2000