Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/26/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/26/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/26/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/26/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/27/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/12/2000