Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/17/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/06/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/06/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/02/2000