Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/29/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/12/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/12/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/12/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/12/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/12/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/12/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/12/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/13/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/04/2000