Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/27/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/27/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/27/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/27/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/30/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/12/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/31/2000