Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/26/2000