Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/29/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/13/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/14/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2000