Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
09/13/2000 Failed of passage in House over veto: On passage, the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 270 - 158 (Roll no. 466).(consideration: CR H7509-7520)
08/05/2000 Vetoed by President.
07/27/2000 Presented to President.
07/21/2000 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 34. Record Vote Number: 226.
07/20/2000 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 271 - 156 (Roll no. 418).(consideration: CR H6609-6618)
07/19/2000 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 106-765 filed.(text of conference report: CR H6582-6586)
07/19/2000 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
07/18/2000 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Roth, Lott and Moynihan.
07/18/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 38. Record Vote Number: 215.
07/12/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 269 - 159 (Roll no. 392).
07/10/2000 Introduced in House