Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/24/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/26/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/26/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/26/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/26/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/26/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/26/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/07/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/12/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/12/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/14/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/18/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/21/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/21/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/26/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/03/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/03/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/11/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/11/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/11/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/11/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/11/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/18/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/18/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/18/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/24/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/27/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/29/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/06/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/06/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/06/2000