Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/20/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/24/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/12/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/06/2000