Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/18/2000