Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/26/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/14/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/18/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/03/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/18/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/24/2000