Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/26/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/27/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/06/2000