Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/26/2000