Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/26/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/26/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/26/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/26/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/07/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/11/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/06/2000