Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 07/20/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/21/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/25/2000