Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/04/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/09/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/24/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/01/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/02/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/02/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/03/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/09/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/09/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/09/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/09/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/11/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/27/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/12/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/17/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/19/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/25/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/26/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/07/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/08/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/25/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/06/2000