Refine your search

Showing 5 of 5 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/03/2000 Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Roth with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-475.
09/07/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 25 (Roll no. 459).(text: CR H7335-7339)
07/26/2000 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-777, Part II.
07/20/2000 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-777, Part I.
07/13/2000 Introduced in House