Committees: H.R.4844 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/13/2000 Referred to
07/19/2000 Markup by
07/20/2000 Reported by House Report 106-777,Part 1
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Ground Transportation07/14/2000 Referred to
07/19/2000 Markup by
07/19/2000 Reported by
House Ways and Means07/13/2000 Referred to
07/25/2000 Markup by
07/26/2000 Reported by House Report 106-777,Part 2
Senate Finance09/08/2000 Referred to
09/28/2000 Markup by
10/03/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-475