There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Violence Against Women Office Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Violence Against Women Office within the Department of Justice.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/24/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/13/2000Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (144)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/13/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/13/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/17/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/17/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/17/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/17/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/19/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/24/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/24/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/24/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/24/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/24/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/27/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/13/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/18/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/12/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/12/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/13/2000 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime07/24/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4848.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4848. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/13/2000)

Violence Against Women Office Act - Establishes within the Department of Justice (DOJ) a Violence Against Women Office, headed by a Director.

Specifies the duties of the Director, including serving as special counsel to the Attorney General on the subject of, and carrying out DOJ functions under the Violence Against Women Act of 1994 and on matters relating to, violence against women.