Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/13/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/13/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/17/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/17/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/17/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/17/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/19/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/24/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/24/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/24/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/24/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/24/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/27/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/13/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/18/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/12/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/12/2000