There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2000

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Benefits Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a cost-of-living adjustment in rates of compensation paid to veterans with service-connected disabilities, to enhance programs providing compensation and life insurance benefits for veterans, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to increase, effective as of December 1, 2000, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-413. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000Presented to President.
10/17/2000Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H9911-9912; text as House agreed to Senate amendments (CR H9911)
10/12/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/2000Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10515-10516)
07/25/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6783-6784)
07/24/2000Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 106-783.
07/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-413. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000HousePresented to President.
10/17/2000-12:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2000-12:10pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H9911-9912; text as House agreed to Senate amendments (CR H9911)
10/17/2000-12:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
10/17/2000-12:07pmHouseMr. Stump moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
10/16/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/12/2000SenatePassed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/2000SenateS.Amdt.4316 Amendment SA 4316 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/2000SenateS.Amdt.4316 Amendment SA 4316 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Specter. (consideration: CR S10516) To amend the title.
10/12/2000SenateS.Amdt.4315 Amendment SA 4315 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/2000SenateS.Amdt.4315 Amendment SA 4315 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Specter. (consideration: CR S10516; text: CR S10516) To provide a substitute.
10/12/2000SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/12/2000SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10515-10516)
07/25/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/25/2000-10:34amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2000-10:34amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6783-6784)
07/25/2000-10:22amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4850.
07/25/2000-10:22amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6783-6786)
07/25/2000-10:22amHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/24/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
07/24/2000HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 106-783.
07/20/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/20/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/18/2000HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
07/18/2000HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
07/18/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/13/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/13/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/13/2000 Referred to
07/20/2000 Markup by
07/24/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-783
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits07/18/2000 Referred to
07/18/2000 Markup by
07/18/2000 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2000 Referred to
10/12/2000 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/12/2000)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2000 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2000, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.