Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/27/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 07/27/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/27/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/07/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/07/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/07/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/20/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/20/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/11/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/27/2000