There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Elders Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that the first $5,000 received from the income of an Indian tribe by any member of the tribe who has attained 50 years of age shall be disregarded in determining the eligibility of the member or the member's household for benefits, and the amount or kind of any benefits of the member or household, under various means-tested public assistance programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
12/07/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/07/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/14/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/31/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
07/26/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/13/2000Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to House Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Banking and Financial Services, Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources07/13/2000 Referred to
House Agriculture07/13/2000 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry07/26/2000 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services07/13/2000 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity07/31/2000 Referred to
House Commerce07/13/2000 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce07/13/2000 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families09/14/2000 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/13/2000 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits12/07/2000 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health12/07/2000 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/13/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4858.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4858. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/13/2000)

Native American Elders Assistance Act - Provides that any portion of the first $5,000 of income of an Indian tribe received in any calendar year by a member of the tribe who has attained 50 years of age shall not be considered income or resources in determining the eligibility of the member or the member's household for any benefit under specified means-tested public assistance programs (including Medicaid or Supplemental Security Income) or the amount or kind of any benefit provided by reason of program eligibility for so long as such portion is retained by the member.