Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/13/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/26/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/12/2000