Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 07/17/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/18/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/18/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/18/2000
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/18/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/18/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/19/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/19/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/19/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/19/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/19/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/20/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/20/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/20/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/24/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/24/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/24/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/24/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/24/2000