Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/05/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/05/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/12/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/12/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/25/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/13/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/05/2000