Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/23/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/23/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/25/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/12/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/13/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/13/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/13/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/12/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/14/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/20/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/21/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/26/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/26/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/04/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/27/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/20/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/20/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/27/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/24/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/24/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/09/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/14/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/14/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/14/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/16/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/16/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/21/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/30/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/03/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/09/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/20/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/13/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/27/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/02/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/11/2000