Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/19/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/24/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/24/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/24/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/24/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/26/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/26/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/19/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/19/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/25/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/25/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/25/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/05/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/11/2000