Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/27/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/27/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/27/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/21/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/21/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/26/2000