Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/24/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 07/24/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/25/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2000