Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/25/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/25/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/25/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/25/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/12/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/17/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/24/2000