Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/26/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/27/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/06/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/14/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/20/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/10/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/17/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/01/2000