Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/07/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/12/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/12/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/13/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/13/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/20/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/20/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/25/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/25/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/03/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/05/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/18/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/24/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/25/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/14/2000