Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/23/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-347.
10/23/2000 Signed by President.
10/12/2000 Presented to President.
10/06/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10113)
09/19/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7755)
09/14/2000 Committee on Transportation discharged.
07/26/2000 Introduced in House