Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/27/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/27/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/06/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/12/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/13/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/13/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/13/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/14/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/20/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/20/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/20/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/20/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/20/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/20/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/20/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/25/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/25/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/10/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/18/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/18/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/18/2000