Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/15/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-519.
11/15/2000 Signed by President.
11/14/2000 Presented to President.
11/14/2000 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 316 - 72, 1 Present (Roll no. 597).(consideration: CR H11900-11901; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H11881-11884)
11/01/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2000 Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Roth with amendments. With written report No. 106-416.
09/13/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 315 - 109, 1 Present (Roll no. 467).(text: CR 9/12/2000 H7416-7419)
09/13/2000 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-845.
07/27/2000 Introduced in House