Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
04/07/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-182.
04/07/2000 Signed by President.
03/29/2000 Presented to President.
03/28/2000 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 419 - 0 (Roll no. 79).(consideration: CR H1441-1447, H1450; text: CR H1441-1442)
03/22/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 42.
03/01/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 422 - 0 (Roll no. 27).(text: CR H583)
03/01/2000 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-507.
03/01/1999 Introduced in House