Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/01/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/04/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/04/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/04/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/23/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/23/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/25/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/12/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/20/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/20/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/29/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/06/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/06/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/18/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/27/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/13/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/14/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/25/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/22/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/22/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/22/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/10/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/10/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/10/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/15/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/15/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/15/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 02/15/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/15/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/15/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/15/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/15/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/15/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/15/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/15/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/16/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/16/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/16/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/16/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/16/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/16/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/16/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/16/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/16/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/16/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/29/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/29/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/29/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/29/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/29/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/29/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/29/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/29/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/29/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/29/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/29/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/29/2000