Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/19/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/26/2000