Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/19/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/24/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/26/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/26/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/27/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/27/2000