Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/18/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/27/2000