Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/12/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/12/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/12/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/13/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/13/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/13/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/13/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/14/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/14/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/18/2000