Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/07/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/07/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/07/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/28/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/03/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/05/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/05/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/05/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/05/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/05/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/05/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/06/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/12/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 10/19/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/19/2000