Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/19/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/25/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/26/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/02/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/05/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/05/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/17/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/26/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/26/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/13/2000