Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/12/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/12/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/12/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/20/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/27/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/05/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/05/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/05/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/12/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/12/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/12/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/01/2000