Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/12/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/20/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/19/2000