There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Home Health Refinement Amendments of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act with respect to payments made under the prospective payment system for home health services furnished under the Medicare Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/13/2000 Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/19/2000 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
09/20/2000 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7900)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/2000 Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/2000 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/2000 Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/2000 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/13/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/14/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/20/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/02/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/02/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/02/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/02/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 10/25/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/13/2000 Referred to
House Commerce09/13/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/19/2000 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (22)

  • Access to health care
  • Congressional reporting requirements
  • Cost accounting
  • Government paperwork
  • Home care services
  • Medical economics
  • Medical fees
  • Medical personnel
  • Medical supplies
  • Medicare
  • Private police
  • Prospective payment systems (Medical care)
  • Rural health
  • Security measures
  • Telemedicine

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5163. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/13/2000)

Home Health Refinement Amendments of 2000 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to: (1) eliminate the 15 percent reduction in payment rates under the Medicare prospective payment system (PPS) for home health services; (2) provide for additional payments for outliers; (3) provide for additional payments under the PPS for home health services furnished in a rural area; (4) provide for exclusion of nonroutine medical supplies under the PPS for home health services; and (5) set forth a rule of construction relating to telehomehealth services.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to report to Congress on the feasibility and advisability of including home health services furnished by telecommunications systems as a home health service.