Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/13/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/14/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/20/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/02/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/02/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/02/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/02/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 10/25/2000